Financial history HARVEST FIELDS HOMES

Charity number: 1071686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £163.39k £159.76k £163.96k £164.42k £167.05k
Total expenditure £83.05k £77.62k £76.42k £101.61k £63.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A