Financial history ST JAMES' MEMORIAL PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1073962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/05/2017 09/05/2018 09/05/2019 09/05/2020 09/05/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A