AMANNAGWU COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 1073873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 January 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 March 2019 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 November 2017 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 January 2017 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required