THE INTERNATIONAL CONTINENCE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1074929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £582.95k £287.51k £755.30k £362.98k £351.60k
Total expenditure £435.51k £409.65k £490.54k £502.03k £535.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £350.08k N/A £42.96k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £231.87k N/A £1.07m N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £990 N/A £1.41k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £184.95k N/A £829.98k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £51.70k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A