THE BRITISH ALBANIAN KOSOVAR COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity number: 1072694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Artan Llabjani Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
ARTA DEDAJ-SALAD Chair 17 May 2012 None on record
Dr Vera Ora Trustee 18 December 2014 None on record
Valbona Mejzini Trustee 01 January 2013 None on record
Burbuqe Bakalli Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record