Financial history KIDS R US COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1071443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £234.01k £224.80k £281.40k £251.23k £79.21k
Total expenditure £197.19k £230.34k £238.43k £230.38k £92.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £287 N/A N/A