AL-AQSA SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity number: 1072676
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £506.73k £588.81k £546.11k £635.71k £664.08k
Total expenditure £480.16k £526.04k £490.71k £569.85k £627.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £152.93k £155.87k £144.35k £172.68k £186.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £6.15k £2.97k £1.72k £836
Income - Other trading activities £4.22k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £502.51k £582.66k £543.13k £633.99k £663.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £479.05k £526.04k £490.71k £569.85k £627.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.11k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0