Financial history EMIH LIMITED

Charity number: 1073254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £7.49m £7.07m £7.26m £4.85m £7.19m
Total expenditure £9.37m £9.09m £9.41m £8.13m £8.54m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.02m £735.72k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.11m £2.54m £2.72m £1.62m £2.51m
Income - Other trading activities £3.21m £2.91m £2.92m £1.62m £2.33m
Income - Charitable activities £1.18m £1.62m £1.63m £585.61k £1.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment -£1.48k £5.79k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.02m £735.72k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.01m £6.85m £7.13m £6.58m £6.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.36m £2.23m £2.28m £1.55m £1.91m
Expenditure - Governance £51.52k £49.44k £48.90k £49.12k £63.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0