Financial history DOWNING COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £12.07m £11.91m £16.20m £10.24m £12.77m
Total expenditure £12.03m £13.48m £12.70m £12.37m £15.62m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.44m £3.04m £6.99m £3.00m £3.29m
Income - Other trading activities £1.36m £1.68m £1.26m £6.94k £835.48k
Income - Charitable activities £8.40m £8.56m £7.92m £7.08m £8.78m
Income - Endowments £1.22m £2.37m £881.30k £668.26k £1.29m
Income - Investment £1.08m £1.01m £913.10k £825.93k £1.15m
Income - Other £258 £100 £95 £1.36k £96
Income - Legacies £39.53k £39.53k £1.60m £1.15m £232.90k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.49m £11.66m £10.87m £10.59m £14.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.54m £1.82m £1.83m £1.78m £1.43m
Expenditure - Governance £106.49k £116.03k £93.29k £139.31k £105.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £47.67k £28.95k £51.50k £90.27k £113.90k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0