Trustees DOWNING COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

48 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Todd Beardwell Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Dr Charlotte Christiane Hammer Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Nathan Rhys James Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr John William Roger Morgan Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Alec Christie Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Richard Justin Davies Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Dr Michael Ashby Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Alison Deirdre Jane Scadden Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
William Andrew Day Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Lucy Winifred Whelan Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Neda Farahi Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Gavin John Flynn Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Frisbee Sheffield Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Joseph Webster Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Alan Bookbinder Trustee 01 October 2018
CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND
Received: On time
Joanne Finnie Jones Trustee 11 May 2018
None on record
Dr NICK RAWLINSON Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Dr ZOE KOURTZI Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Dr Michael Crisp Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Dr EWAN JONES Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Dr BRENDAN PLANT Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
Dr MONICA MORENO FIGUEROA Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
DR SARAH KENNEDY Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
Dr JOHN STUART RICHER Trustee 26 June 2013
None on record
Dr KAMRAN YUNUS Trustee 14 February 2013
None on record
Dr TIM BURTON Trustee 12 April 2011
None on record
Dr ZOE HELEN BARBER Trustee
None on record
Dr JIE LI Trustee
None on record
Dr NATALIA MORA-SITJA Trustee
None on record
Dr GUY BARNETT WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
PROF IAN GARETH ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
THE REVD DR KEITH EYEONS Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR ADAM NOEL LEDGEWAY Trustee
None on record
Dr LIPING XU Trustee
None on record
Dr AMY LOUISE MILTON Trustee
None on record
Dr BRIGITTE STEGER Trustee
None on record
Professor IAN JAMES Trustee
None on record
Dr MICHAEL TREVOR BRAVO Trustee
None on record
Dr DAVID ROBERT PRATT Trustee
None on record
Dr SOPHIA DEMOULINI Trustee
None on record
Professor ROBERT HARLE Trustee
None on record
Dr MARTA MORGADO CORREIA Trustee
None on record
Dr WILLIAM O'NEILL Trustee
None on record
PROF DAVID JOHN WALES Trustee
None on record
Prof Nicholas Coleman Trustee
THE PATHOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
PROF GRAHAM JOHN VIRGO Trustee
None on record
Dr PAUL DEREK BARKER Trustee
BARTON RECREATION GROUND IMPROVEMENT GROUP
Received: On time
PROF CHRISTOPHER ALLIM HANIFF Trustee
None on record