Financial history THE BOVEY TRACEY PLAYERS

Charity number: 1108788
Charity reporting is overdue by 174 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £3.03k £3.23k £5.62k £438 £55
Total expenditure £4.19k £3.39k £4.47k £978 £950
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A