Accounts and annual returns NEW COMMUNITY CHURCH ELLESMERE

Charity number: 1074892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required