SOCIETY FOR NAME STUDIES IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 1077455
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Gregory Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
Professor Diana Whaley Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR PETER COLIN MCCLURE Trustee 21 April 2013
THE INCORPORATED TRUSTEES OF THE NUNBURNHOLME TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Professor Carole Hough Chair 06 April 2014 None on record
Dr KEITH BRIGGS Trustee 21 April 2013 None on record
Dr David Parsons Trustee 07 April 2013 None on record
Dr James Butler Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Dr Harry Parkin Trustee 29 March 2015 None on record
JULIA STANBRIDGE ACMA Trustee None on record