THE MANJULA AND MADHU JAIN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1077453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £117 £0 £0 £672 £1
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £1.10k £501
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A