St. Peter's Droitwich C of E Academy Parent Teacher Association (PTA)

Charity number: 1072259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £20.92k £14.73k £12.52k £6.90k £6.92k
Total expenditure £24.43k £17.37k £12.67k £6.92k £5.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A