Dogfen lywodraethu RAUF R DENKTAS TURKISH SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2008 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2012 as amended on 11 Sep 2021 as amended on 30 Sep 2020 as amended on 14 Jan 2022 as amended on 02 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO DEVELOP EDUCATION IN TURKISH LANGUAGE AND CULTURE AND IN SUCH OTHER SUBJECTS AS THE ASSOCIATION MAY, THROUGH ITS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, TRAINING AND FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS SO AS TO HELP THEM GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.