Financial history HMC PROJECTS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE

Charity number: 1074491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £163.73k £137.20k £127.37k £90.60k £95.55k
Total expenditure £137.74k £120.25k £83.99k £61.22k £46.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A