Dogfen lywodraethu THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MICHAEL THE ARCHANGEL SHALFLEET ISLE OF WIGHT FABRIC RESTORATION TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/05/2012 as amended on 14 Jan 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE,REPAIR, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, IMPROVEMENT, BEAUTIFICATION,AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.MICHAEL THE ARCHANGEL, SHALFLEET, ISLE OF WIGHT, ITS MONUMENTS,FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD INCLUDING THE LANDS UPON WHICH THEY STAND AND WHICH ARE OWNED BY THE CHURCH.
Maes buddion
SHALFLEET
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.