Financial history INDEPENDENCE INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1073291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £223.52k £227.43k £297.97k £231.40k £403.57k
Total expenditure £276.04k £204.00k £272.24k £257.20k £306.77k
Income from government contracts £115.58k £117.79k £83.50k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A