ANGOLAN CIVIC COMMUNITIES ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1081831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 April 2021 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 April 2021 802 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 December 2017 328 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required