CAERBRYN WELFARE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1077737
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £4.49k £5.23k £8.01k £5.62k £5.32k
Total expenditure £4.47k £8.41k £5.25k £5.14k £5.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A