Financial history EL SHADDAI CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1076768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £290.21k £274.80k £291.44k £265.53k £252.00k
Total expenditure £329.97k £266.29k £299.94k £268.46k £260.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A