Trustees HOLSTEIN UK

Charity number: 1072998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Smale Chair 18 October 2014
None on record
Ben Yates Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
David Lawson Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Richard Thomas Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Andrew James Williamson Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
William John Williams Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
John Hartley Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record
Jane Whittaker Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record
Matthew Winter Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record
Stephen Hill Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
Wallace Stewart Gregg Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
David Yates Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
David Jones Trustee 29 June 2017
WEST MIDLANDS HOLSTEIN CLUB
Received: On time
Peter Prior Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
Sandy Pirie Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record