CLACTON FAMILY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1075437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.33m £4.69m £4.52m £4.47m £4.45m
Total expenditure £4.32m £4.56m £4.79m £4.94m £4.42m
Income from government contracts £3.73m £4.58m £3.56m £3.87m N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £500 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £933.98k £0 £0 £0 £904.76k
Income - Charitable activities £3.40m £4.69m £4.52m £4.47m £3.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25 £211 £2 £2 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.32m £4.56m £4.78m £4.71m £3.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £823.30k
Expenditure - Governance £1.87k £9.60k £9.60k £9.90k £9.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £7.87k £237.98k £50.37k