CARE FOR THE CARERS

Charity number: 1074906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £980.11k £835.63k £831.35k £813.41k £2.23m
Total expenditure £886.30k £895.08k £872.38k £765.30k £710.70k
Income from government contracts £751.03k £736.51k £0 £688.32k £594.50k
Income from government grants £14.15k £5.68k £747.32k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £172.69k £79.09k £24.95k £811.78k £43.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £806.59k £755.59k £804.25k £0 £671.29k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £833 £956 £2.15k £1.63k £26.33k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.49m
Income - Legacies £143.35k £29.20k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £878.86k £872.12k £872.38k £724.64k £672.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.44k £22.95k £0 £40.66k £38.43k
Expenditure - Governance £54.47k £17.04k £11.14k £12.38k £19.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0