Trustees ARK - T CENTRE
Charity number: 1079495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ivan Wise | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Hassan Elmi Sabrie | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Rice | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Jostins-Dean | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Joseph Levy | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shakeel Marham | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Evans | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW JOHN GANT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.