TAVISTOCK RIDING FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 1073407
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total income £1.77k £1.97k £3.28k £1.80k £1.56k
Total expenditure £5.53k £8.47k £1.80k £2.40k £2.02k