DURHAM CHRISTIAN PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1077549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £345.29k £376.32k £351.35k £457.44k £884.32k
Total expenditure £312.20k £343.36k £354.76k £427.90k £460.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £2.96k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.39k £43.94k £72.45k £137.75k £168.76k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £843.64k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.24k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £435
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £405.83k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £55.11k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0