Accounts and annual returns CARLISLE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1073687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required