HANDICAP INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1082565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nana Obuo Raphael Trustee 27 May 2020 None on record
Ayse Guel Suevari-Wicks Trustee 27 May 2020 None on record
BENJAMIN COHEN Trustee 25 May 2011
WISE THOUGHTS Received: On time
Peter Burdin Chair 04 November 2016 None on record
Lynette Eastman Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
Vhernie Manickavasagar Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record
CHLOE MARSHALL Trustee 29 July 2014 None on record
Thomas Charles Morrow Trustee 30 March 2020 None on record