Accounts and annual returns BLISS=ABILITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1074944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window