Accounts and annual returns WARFIELD GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required