Financial history WARFIELD GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.38k £4.93k £5.57k £11.67k £1.47k
Total expenditure £6.93k £7.24k £8.12k £5.83k £842
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A