ALDERSBROOK & WANSTEAD RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.09k £3.03k £2.13k £332 £0
Total expenditure £2.26k £3.31k £1.57k £960 £694
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A