Financial history ETAL GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.36k £1.65k £1.23k £2.81k £243
Total expenditure £4.69k £2.81k £3.81k £2.46k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A