Shantona Women's & Family Centre Ltd.

Charity number: 1075752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £465.25k £485.66k £457.81k £543.56k £674.93k
Total expenditure £420.72k £479.60k £494.28k £512.50k £549.88k
Income from government contracts £350.38k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.86k £407.64k £303.53k £388.64k £416.96k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £340 £2.27k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £533.38k £668.14k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £280 £193
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £9.56k £4.33k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £512.50k £549.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.52k £1.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0