THE LERI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1075107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 March 2020 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 March 2020 15 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 02 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 02 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 02 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 02 March 2016 25 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 March 2016 25 November 2016 On time Download