AZHAR ACADEMY

Charity number: 1080849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £1.18m £1.97m £1.35m £1.31m £1.55m
Total expenditure £950.60k £1.10m £1.21m £1.31m £1.58m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.05k £109.13k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £392.95k £1.05m £224.71k £190.96k £170.73k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £1.12m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £782.30k £924.66k £0 £1.12m £1.38m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £947.60k £1.10m £1.17m £1.31m £1.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £3.60k £3.60k £3.60k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0