Financial history 4SIGHT VISION SUPPORT

Charity number: 1075447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £416.90k £368.72k £357.45k £423.24k £364.72k
Total expenditure £475.30k £555.11k £518.55k £398.61k £424.28k
Income from government contracts £30.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.78k £43.38k £24.75k £61.85k £31.54k