Financial history DOMINICA SECONDARY SCHOOLS SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION ( DASSSA )

Charity number: 1076882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.41k £3.80k £9.97k £4.44k £2.03k
Total expenditure £4.95k £3.08k £6.23k £10.85k £1.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A