Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE HOLY LAND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 1079893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window