Financial history FRIENDS OF THE HOLY LAND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 1079893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £58.17k £30.25k £22.96k £40.02k £36.48k
Total expenditure £60.85k £24.53k £31.79k £37.54k £38.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A