LAMBETH LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1076204
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £619.37k £592.92k £567.96k £605.41k £819.75k
Total expenditure £628.55k £558.95k £557.50k £651.87k £779.39k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £97.31k £0 £569.76k
Income from government grants N/A £112.40k £0 £97.31k £91.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £14.06k £26.27k £12.04k £11.85k £26.00k
Income - Other trading activities £273.06k £247.94k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £332.25k £318.71k £555.91k £593.54k £793.76k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1 £4 £15 £0 £1
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £623.48k £554.35k £557.50k £651.87k £779.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.50k £4.50k £4.50k £11.40k £14.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0