LAMBETH LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1076204

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Griffiths Clarke Trustee 13 January 2014 None on record
OLIVER CAMPBELL Trustee None on record
Barbara Griessner Trustee 12 May 2015 None on record
Stephen Buntu-Bwona Trustee 01 March 2016 None on record
AXEL LANDIN Trustee 13 March 2018 None on record
HUGH LANDSDOWNE Trustee 19 December 2011 None on record
Bruce Bebington Chair 28 April 2017 None on record
HARRY DRONFIELD Trustee None on record
Charlie Kenny Trustee 15 July 2014 None on record
LAURA HOBEY-HAMSHER Trustee 19 December 2011 None on record