Trustees LYTHAM IN BLOOM TRUST
Charity number: 1076465
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Horridge | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Fenton | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Nicola Whitehead | Trustee | 07 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Patricia Taylor | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Thomas | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|||||
GREG LEWIS ANDERTON | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN BOULD | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM TREVOR MACKEY | Trustee | 05 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR TIM ASHTON BSC (HONS) | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.