Financial history BRADVILLE HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1076247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £12.20k £14.07k £12.71k £5.47k £10.95k
Total expenditure £15.23k £10.66k £10.52k £10.15k £10.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £3.64k N/A £10.00k