Financial history WOODROFFE BENTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1075272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/12/2017 02/12/2018 02/12/2019 02/12/2020 02/12/2021
Total gross income £339.69k £285.24k £314.15k £234.67k £224.12k
Total expenditure £552.32k £475.35k £335.23k £308.91k £425.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A