Trustees WOODROFFE BENTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1075272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward James White Chair 06 November 2019
None on record
William Matthew Galbraith White Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Chiyo Rimington Trustee 15 July 2020
None on record
Jill Wesley Trustee 19 October 2016
None on record
RICHARD ANTHONY PAGE Trustee 01 November 2011
None on record
JAMES JERVIS HOPE Trustee 06 April 1999
None on record