BRANSBY HORSES

Charity number: 1075601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.33m £5.02m £5.63m £5.34m £6.89m
Total expenditure £4.25m £4.93m £5.09m £6.05m £6.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £191.45k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.69m £3.19m £3.99m £3.53m £4.92m
Income - Other trading activities £377.93k £357.56k £572.85k £717.46k £763.44k
Income - Charitable activities £229.62k £262.50k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £988.01k £1.14m £998.35k £921.94k £717.56k
Income - Other £48.19k £69.17k £67.28k £172.22k £483.15k
Income - Legacies £2.19m £2.73m £3.35m £3.03m £4.27m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.42m £4.01m £4.13m £5.03m £5.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £836.05k £918.75k £912.27k £566.12k £571.92k
Expenditure - Governance £16.39k £14.88k £19.81k £21.49k £23.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £70.50k £66.00k £66.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £126.21k £126.38k £147.59k £133.74k £131.09k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £50.71k £453.67k £491.03k