AVENUES SOUTH EAST

Charity number: 1079576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.51m £15.23m £15.78m £15.22m £16.15m
Total expenditure £13.95m £15.74m £16.61m £15.48m £16.01m
Income from government contracts £13.91m £14.40m £14.71m £15.18m £15.44m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.00k £80.00k £0 £0 £280.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £14.47m £15.11m £15.78m £15.18m £15.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £35.38k £42.00k £34.00k £42.00k £64.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £75.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.95m £15.74m £16.61m £15.48m £16.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.60m £36.00k £32.00k £18.00k £13.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0